pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Network For Women In Dairying
Dairy Womens Network
CC35685
9429043133994
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
May 31

Address for service

PO Box 1468
Waikato Mail Centre
Hamilton Central
Hamilton
3240
2/36 Thackeray Street
Hamilton Lake
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

07 974 4850
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/dwn.co.nz/
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/dairy_women
https://www.youtube.com/user/DairyWomensNetworkNZ


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Today's dairy women are multi-talented, capable and influential and the Dairy Women's Network works alongside our members to give them additional skills to take them to the next level in their careers. The Network's purpose is to develop and educate women to add value to the business of dairying. Our members have access to professional and personal support through a mix of face to face gatherings and web based contact, which includes our annual conference, Dairy Modules training programme, regional meetings and internet forums.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Mentor And Leadership

Other (please state)

(Women involved in Dairy Industry - farmers and others), Animals, General public

Entity Structure

Dairy Womens Network is funded by DairyNZ farmers levy and commercial partners to deliver Dairy Modules training programme, regional meetings and internet forums. DWN has a huge volunteer base of regional group convenors within the regions.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/11/2018 7/11/2018 $1,181,968 $1,127,553
30/11/2017 15/11/2017 $1,106,912 $1,197,199
30/11/2016 14/11/2016 $1,242,426 $1,214,573
30/11/2015 30/11/2015 $1,485,603 $1,197,038
30/11/2014 27/11/2014 $1,498,880 $1,453,800
30/11/2013 29/11/2013 $1,133,422 $1,184,136
30/11/2012 20/11/2012 $721,686 $632,560
30/11/2011 2/12/2011 $504,620 $487,507
30/11/2010 7/12/2010 $352,246 $323,568
30/11/2009 2/12/2009 $329,500 $382,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Karen Forlong Trustee 14/06/2016
Mark Heer Trustee 10/02/2016
Tracy Brown Trustee 10/02/2016
Pamela Storey Trustee 13/07/2015
Donna Smit Trustee 18/09/2014
Alison Gibb Trustee 1/02/2013
Cathy Jean Brown Chair 15/10/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Justine Kidd Chair, Trustee 20/10/2016
Christine Rae Stevens Trustee 12/05/2016
Hilary Webber Trustee 15/10/2015
Maree Crowley-Hughes Trustee 17/09/2015
Angela Margaret Fullerton Trustee 22/10/2014
Michelle Anne Wilson Trustee 22/10/2014
Robyn Maree Judd Trustee 22/06/2014
Barbara Kuriger Trustee 5/05/2014
Susan Pattie Lindsay Trustee 23/10/2013
Neal Shaw Trustee 20/08/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/11/2012 NOC010
10/07/2012 NOC007
10/07/2012 NOC006
24/05/2012 NOC005
24/05/2012 NOC004
2/12/2011 AR005
7/12/2010 AR004
29/07/2010 NOC003
2/12/2009 AR003
9/02/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents