pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Orama Christian Trust
Orama Oasis
CC33035
9429042817710
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Orama Christian Fellowship Trust 30/06/2008
Orama Christian Trust 1/11/2008

Address for service

PO Box 67
Port Fitzroy
Great Barrier Island (aotea Island)
0963
300 Karaka Bay Road
Great Barrier Island (aotea Island) 0991
Great Barrier Island (aotea Island)
0991

Charity's other details

09 429 0063
09 429 0155


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provide a stunning environment whereby people from all Ethnic Groups can be Refreshed and Educated about the World we live in and encouraged to start a journey with their Creator.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

( Orama Oasis provides wonderful facilities in a stunning Environment for all Ethnic Groups to be refreshed through Training, Community, Outdoor Education, Rest&Relaxation with Christian Values. )

Other (please state)

(Secondary School Students involved with Hillary Outdoors Education Program Youth/Leadership Training Christian GroupsEnvironmental & Conservation GroupsCommunity and Volunteers)

Other (please state)

(Students from NZ Secondary Schools and Overseas and VolunteersIndividuals, Groups and families of all agesSolo mums with kids needing a well earned break)

Entity Structure

Provide Accommodation,Dining ,Recreational & Outdoor facilities for 20 Staff and Volunteers and up to 120 Guests at our beautiful seaside Complex at Karaka Bay, Port Abercrombie, Gt Barrier Island,Nth Island NZ

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Aotea Education Limited (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2020 2/11/2020 $1,140,227 $1,122,122
30/09/2019 30/08/2019 $1,220,606 $1,151,966
30/09/2018 22/08/2019 $922,071 $1,088,610
30/09/2017 12/01/2018 $788,970 $793,140
31/12/2016 16/01/2017 $1,005,807 $1,011,783
31/12/2015 2/03/2016 $1,137,611 $785,834
31/12/2014 20/03/2015 $915,183 $892,018
31/12/2013 2/12/2013 $810,833 $801,397
31/12/2012 18/12/2012 $648,475 $636,535

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 9 months from 1 July 2016 to 31 March 2017.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kirstie Mackey Trustee 7/11/2020
Norm Winger Trustee 7/11/2020
Kevin Findlay Trustee 9/09/2019
Henry Malcolm Hungerford Trustee 20/10/2009
Warren Fountain Trustee 12/04/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jessica Cooper Trustee 20/04/2021
clinton Sanford Trustee 1/03/2021
Rodger Jack Trustee 1/03/2021
Denis Brian Turnbull Trustee 7/11/2020
Jessica Olivia Cooper Trustee 7/11/2020
Fleur Winger Trustee 4/05/2020
Eric Robert Murray Trustee 8/09/2019
Margaret Lillian Fountain Trustee 8/09/2019
Andrew Jeremy Dyck Trustee 12/08/2018
John Nicholas Elliott Trustee 12/08/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/04/2021 NOC026
29/03/2021 NOC025
29/03/2021 NOC024
29/07/2018 NOC020
17/01/2017 NOC018
25/11/2016 NOC015
7/09/2016 NOC014
16/07/2015 NOC013
6/07/2015 NOC012
18/12/2012 AR005

Charity Documents