pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Mamaku Point Conservation Trust
Mamaku Point Conservation Reserve
CC55109
Registered

Registration details

27/11/2017
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 3131
Shortland Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1140
402 Horseshoe Bay Road
Stewart Island/rakiura
Stewart Island
9818

Charity's other details

021783043


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust was established to operate a conservation sanctuary called the Mamaku Point Conservation Reserve. Its purpose is to: • Conserve, enhance and maintain the health and biodiversity of native flora and fauna and to re-establish native species not currently found in the Reserve. • Advance education relating to New Zealand’s flora and fauna by permitting access for community participation, education and research activities. • Work towards complete environmental and financial sustainability.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

The Mamaku Point Conservation Trust was established pursuant to a Deed of Trust dated 19 June 2017 and incorporated as a charitable trust board on 20 September 2017, incorporation number 2682071. The Trust currently has two Trustees, Roy Thompson and Phillip Smith. Further Trustees are to be added.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 11/08/2018 $54,372 $38,018

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Philip John Seddon Trustee 2/12/2017
Phillip John Smith Trustee 20/09/2017
Roy William Thompson Trustee 19/06/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/01/2018 NOC001

Charity Documents