pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Mamaku Point Conservation Trust
Mamaku Point Conservation Reserve
CC55109
9429046369222
Registered

Registration details

27/11/2017
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 3131
Shortland Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1140
402 Horseshoe Bay Road
Stewart Island/rakiura
Stewart Island
9818

Charity's other details

021783043


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust was established to operate a conservation sanctuary called the Mamaku Point Conservation Reserve. Its purpose is to: • Conserve, enhance and maintain the health and biodiversity of native flora and fauna and to re-establish native species not currently found in the Reserve. • Advance education relating to New Zealand’s flora and fauna by permitting access for community participation, education and research activities. • Work towards complete environmental and financial sustainability.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

The Mamaku Point Conservation Trust was established pursuant to a Deed of Trust dated 19 June 2017 and incorporated as a charitable trust board on 20 September 2017, incorporation number 2682071.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2018 11/08/2018 $54,372 $38,018

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Philip John Seddon Trustee 2/12/2017
Phillip John Smith Trustee 20/09/2017
Roy William Thompson Trustee 19/06/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/01/2018 NOC001

Charity Documents