pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Love Soup Hibiscus Coast
Love Soup
CC53300
N/A
Registered

Registration details

31/03/2016
February 28

Address for service

717 Whangaparaoa Road
Stanmore Bay
Whangaparaoa
0930

Charity's other details

0220749526
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/LoveSoupHibiscusCoast/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Food Rescue delivering food to organisations that help people in need, Providing free community meals, Workshops, Community gardens, food parcels

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Community development

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Social services, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Feed the Need, Mind Body and Spirit

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/08/2018 28/07/2018 $36,680 $25,558
31/08/2017 1/10/2017 $1,253 $1,074

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Yinon Shimi Trustee 27/09/2017
Anita Ransfield Treasurer 29/11/2016
Richard Ransfield trustee 29/11/2016
Julie King Chair 22/03/2016
June Waith Secretary 22/03/2016
Raewyn Mckay trustee 22/03/2016
Simon King trustee 22/03/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/12/2016 NOC005
29/11/2016 NOC004
29/11/2016 NOC003
29/11/2016 NOC002
29/11/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents