pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Pregnancy Help Incorporated
CC51116
9429043266807
Registered

Registration details

21/11/2014
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 12000
Wellington
9010

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

- To provide free and client focused practical assistance, information and advice during pregnancy and early childhood. - To work collaboratively with other organisations to enhance each other's work.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Social services

Health, Environment / conservation, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

It is comprised of the National Executive Team, 8 front line branches located in Auckland, Canterbury, Central Hawkes Bay, Dunedin, Greater Wellington, Invercargill, Taranaki and Taupo.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2018 20/11/2018 $469,249 $465,666
31/12/2017 17/11/2017 $558,319 $546,456
31/12/2016 20/11/2016 $532,186 $596,047
31/12/2015 22/12/2015 $614,155 $643,383

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Hellene Janet Loise Ross Executive Member 11/11/2017
Jamie Siniva Isaia National President 4/11/2016
Stephen Cairns Executive member 4/11/2016
Lai Choo Too National Treasurer 7/11/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Salena Branson Executive Member 11/11/2017
Stephenie Sisson National President 1/07/2017
Michelle Ranford Executive Member 5/11/2016
Diane Thornton National President 4/11/2016
Alana Murray National Executive 1/05/2016
Dianne Beatrice Acker National Executive 1/05/2016
Donna Marie Te Amo National Executive 1/05/2016
Elizabeth Henderson National Executive 1/05/2016
Julie Cherie Carter Executive Officer 1/05/2016
Sandra Scott National Executive 1/05/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/05/2017 NOC006
8/05/2017 NOC004
19/12/2016 NOC003

Charity Documents