pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Outerspaces Charitable Trust
CC52399
N/A
Registered

Registration details

25/09/2015
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 9076
Marion Square
Wellington
6141
Level 3, 148 Cuba Street
Te Aro
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

027 763 9793
Facebook icon image
https://facebook.com/outerspacesnz
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/outerspacesnz


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

OuterSpaces is an umbrella organisation which brings together four local LGBTIQ+ (lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, intersex and queer) youth support organisations under one charitable trust. OuterSpaces runs support groups for gender and sexuality diverse young people in Wellington and Lower Hutt. We work with highly vulnerable young people in a primarily voluntary capacity.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Community development

Children / young people

Entity Structure

Outerspaces has an operational board and a large group of volunteers. Young people are at the centre of Outerspaces. We work for universal respect for, and celebration of, sexuality, body and gender diversity.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 24/09/2018 $51,914 $27,239
30/09/2017 25/07/2017 $24,230 $12,971
30/09/2016 20/09/2016 $9,069 $3,500

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alice Jean Wood Trustee 8/11/2018
Susan Moya Lytollis Trustee 12/07/2018
Sara Elizabeth Fraser Trustee and Chair 14/06/2018
Judy O'Brien Trustee and Secretary 17/10/2017
Jevon Wright Trustee and Treasurer 29/06/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kabel Manga Trustee and Chair 13/09/2018
Carl Greenwood Trustee 14/06/2018
Sara Fraser Trustee 14/06/2018
Jess Tombs Trustee and Secretary 8/02/2018
Kirsten Smith Trustee 12/01/2017
Laressa Donaldson Trustee 12/10/2016
Suzanne Hocking Secretary 12/10/2016
Herbert Bartley Trustee 9/08/2016
Connor Meiklejohn Trustee 5/08/2016
Kassie Hartendorp Trustee 22/07/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/11/2018 NOC013
29/11/2018 NOC012
24/08/2018 NOC010
19/10/2017 NOC009
19/10/2017 NOC008
26/04/2017 NOC006
13/01/2017 NOC005
24/11/2016 NOC004
18/11/2016 NOC003
20/10/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents