pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Hunger Project New Zealand
CC36839
9429042868828
Registered

Registration details

14/01/2009
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 10066
Dominion Road
Auckland
1446
35 Stafford Road
58 Surrey Crescent
Northcote Point
Auckland
0627

Charity's other details

094806032


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Hunger Project is a global not for profit strategic organisation committed to the sustainable end of world hunger. Our vision is a world where every woman, man and child leads life of self-reliance and dignity. Our mission is to end hunger and poverty with sustainable, grassroots, women-centred strategies and advocating for their widespread adoption in countries throughout the world.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Fundraising for alleviation of chronic hunger and poverty), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Fund-raising

Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, International activities, Economic development, Promotion of volunteering, Aid and Development

Other (please state)

(People living in chronic hunger in developing countries in Africa, South East Asia and Latin America)

Entity Structure

Board of Trustees, CEO, volunteers.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30/09/2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30/09/2010.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2018 14/06/2018 $152,240 $112,705
30/06/2017 14/06/2017 $108,960 $109,727
30/06/2016 26/04/2016 $83,584 $84,803
30/09/2015 20/10/2015 $83,584 $84,803
30/09/2014 15/01/2015 $87,712 $105,896
30/09/2013 12/02/2014 $86,844 $79,840
30/09/2012 28/09/2012 $94,922 $93,846
30/09/2011 31/08/2011 $82,562 $61,704
30/09/2010 28/09/2010 $66,080 $3,280
30/09/2009 - - - - Exemption

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lisa Gunnery Trustee 11/12/2018
Annabell Chartres Trustee 7/08/2018
Darrin Mark Bull Trustee 1/06/2018
Paula ter Brake Chairman 1/06/2018
Nomita Singh Trustee 1/12/2015
Robert Banks trustee 28/05/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Elizabeth Emily Sinden Trustee 16/11/2018
Karen Elizabeth Johns Trustee 1/06/2018
Shirley Rosa Hardwick Trustee 1/06/2018
Sharron Botica Trustee 31/01/2018
Leanne Marie Royden Treasurer 1/03/2017
Lyn Borich Board member 1/03/2017
Ros Hiini Secretary 1/03/2017
Ruth Osborne Country Director 31/10/2015
Vanessa Sader Fundraising Administrator 1/06/2015
Allan Wyllie Board member 28/05/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
9/11/2015 NOC011
2/07/2014 NOC010
6/11/2013 NOC006
18/09/2013 NOC005
26/09/2012 AR005
28/11/2011 NOC004
31/08/2011 AR004
9/11/2010 NOC003
28/09/2010 AR003
28/09/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents