pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Ranfurly Veteran Care Limited
CC31845
9429033184104
Deregistered
02/06/2015
This entity was removed from the Charities Register because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act.

Below are details of Ranfurly Veteran Care Limited at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
September 30
Registration history
Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 2/06/2015 This entity was removed from the Charities Register because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act.
Registered 30/06/2008

Address for service

PO Box 27393
Mount Roskill
Auckland
1440
539 Mount Albert Road
Three Kings
Auckland
1042

Charity's other details

(09)6258310
(09)6242080


Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Social services

Accommodation / housing, Health, Community development, People with disabilities

Older people

People with disabilities, General public


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 March 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 March 2010.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2015 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2014 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2013 25/02/2013 $6,439,912 $6,363,700
31/03/2012 15/02/2012 $6,173,472 $5,791,559
31/03/2011 12/07/2011 $5,791,754 $5,837,224
31/03/2010 15/02/2010 $5,655,000 $5,643,000

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anthony Pierce Hay director 22/07/2010
Christopher Bernard Mullane director 22/07/2010
John Douglas Mcguire director 22/07/2010
Peter Jon Skogstad director 22/07/2010
Rebecca Mary Macky director 22/07/2010
Graeme Mckenzie Mckay Director 27/08/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Marilynne Wakefield Accountant 12/07/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/02/2013 AR005
12/07/2011 AR003
15/02/2010 AR002

Charity Documents