pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Open Education Resource Foundation Limited
CC40964
9429032328097
Registered

Registration details

2/06/2009
December 31

Address for service

OTAGO POLYTECHNIC
Private Bag 1910
Dunedin
9054
Otago Polytechnic
Forth Street
Dunedin
9016

Charity's other details

03 474 8474


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The OERF is an independent, not-for-profit organisation that provides leadership, international networking and support for educators and educational institutions to achieve their objectives through Open Education.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Online Resources

Education / training / research

Children / young people

General public, Students

Entity Structure

The OERF is governed by a Board of Directors appointed in accordance with the constitution of the OERF.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2020 14/06/2020 $322,134 $315,263
30/06/2019 24/06/2019 $269,825 $287,709
30/06/2018 20/06/2018 $445,633 $459,991
30/06/2017 22/06/2017 $470,000 $547,000
30/06/2016 25/07/2016 $532,000 $454,000
30/06/2015 30/06/2015 $331,000 $293,000
30/06/2014 11/06/2014 $232,000 $214,000
30/06/2013 28/06/2013 $212,000 $243,000
30/06/2012 19/06/2012 $249,000 $260,000
30/06/2011 27/06/2011 $194,000 $262,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Asha Kanwar Director 17/03/2020
Megan Gibbons Director 8/10/2019
Oonagh Mary Theresa McGirr Director 19/12/2018
Sandra Wills Director 6/04/2017
Jim Taylor Director 14/12/2011
Philip John Cullen Secretary 28/04/2009
Rory Patrick Mcgreal director 28/04/2009
Wayne Grant Mackintosh director 28/04/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Peter Coolbear Director 1/04/2020
Mary Burgess Director 13/02/2020
Robin Roderick Day director 31/07/2019
Christoper John Staynes director 5/08/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/01/2017 NOC004
27/06/2011 AR003
4/10/2010 NOC002
29/09/2010 AR002

Charity Documents