pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Animal Welfare Institute Of New Zealand
AWINZ
CC11235
Registered

Registration details

28/09/2007
June 30

Address for service

1308 State Highway 3
RD 5
Te Kuiti
3985

Charity's other details

07 878 8689
0

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Promotion of animal welfare by funding research

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Care / protection of animals

Education / training / research, Social services

Animals

Children / young people, General public

Entity Structure

Trust Board

Annual Returns


Date Submitted For Year Ended Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
- 30/06/2017 - - - -
11/01/2017 30/06/2016 $4,161 $5
9/12/2015 30/06/2015 $7,078 $1,779
31/12/2014 30/06/2014 $15,749 $7,317
3/01/2014 30/06/2013 $59,387 $9,039
25/01/2013 30/06/2012 $4,843 $3,425
28/12/2011 30/06/2011 $3,112 $1,378
10/01/2011 30/06/2010 $24,323 $30,807
15/03/2010 30/06/2009 $29,219 $76,458
7/02/2009 30/06/2008 $21,456 $26,535

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Thomas Stanley Didovich Trustee 21/01/2015
Graeme John Coutts Trustee 27/06/2007
Neil Edward Wells Trustee 27/06/2007
Wyn Norien Hoadley Trustee 27/06/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Thomas Stanley Didovich Trustee 5/12/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/11/2015 NOC009
28/07/2015 NOC008
3/01/2014 NOC007
13/12/2012 AR006
28/12/2011 NOC002
10/01/2011 AR004
15/03/2010 AR003

Charity Documents