pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Dame Malvina Major Foundation
Dame Malvina Major Foundation
CC10225
9429042856665
Registered

Registration details

30/04/2007
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 9976
Marion Square
Wellington
6141
Flat A71
10 Ebor Street
Te Aro
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

(04)3849745
(04)3849785


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To educate and assist the education of primarily New Zealand singers and persons associated with the performance of the performing arts in New Zealand

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Community development, Fund-raising

Children / young people

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2018 1/06/2018 $523,654 $472,993
30/06/2017 9/05/2017 $426,454 $397,937
30/06/2016 15/05/2016 $466,966 $442,775
30/06/2015 12/05/2015 $415,108 $409,059
30/06/2014 27/04/2014 $268,348 $337,025
30/06/2013 1/05/2013 $526,451 $541,693
30/06/2012 28/04/2012 $461,788 $464,254
30/06/2011 23/05/2011 $436,947 $424,581
30/06/2010 5/07/2010 $401,478 $376,992
30/06/2009 3/06/2009 $400,833 $311,490

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
anna Elizabeth Rose Pierard Trustee 22/07/2016
Jennifer Wollerman Trustee 15/04/2013
Alan Leslie Judge Trustee 28/03/2011
Lindsay William Lloyd Trustee 30/11/2007
Alexandra Jocelyn Ann Midgley Trustee 20/03/2007
Dame Malvina Lorraine Major Trustee 20/03/2007
David Alexander Jackson Chairman 20/03/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Alan John Pollock Trustee 11/07/2015
Angela Mary Gorton Trustee 11/07/2015
Felicity Anne McLennan Trustee 31/03/2013
Robert John Martin Trustee 31/03/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/05/2016 NOC009
1/05/2013 AR007
28/04/2012 NOC003
23/05/2011 AR005
23/05/2011 NOC002
3/06/2009 AR003

Charity Documents