#.
#.

Charity Summary

Information supplied by charities and displayed on the Charities Register is not verified by the Charities Commission.

These are the current details for: The Science Centre Trust

Charity details


Legal name of the charity
The Science Centre Trust
Other Name
Registration details
Status
Registered
Date
25/03/2008
Registration number
CC22068
IRD Number
Restricted
Annual Return Due Date
30/06/2015
Address for service
Charity's street address
144 Te Awe Awe Street
Hokowhitu
Palmerston North 4410
Charity's postal address
PO Box 1015
Palmerston North Central
Palmerston North 4440
Charity's other details
Phone (day)
021 578323
Fax
Email
ianjw@xtra.co.nz
Website

Charitable purpose


Note: Main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are in brackets

Sectors
(Education / training / research)
Activities
(Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities))
Beneficiaries
(General public), Children / young people, Children / young people, Children / young people

Areas of Operation


Manawatu - Wanganui

Officers


Officer Name Effective Date
Susan McCoard 25/03/2008
David Anthony Parry 25/03/2008
Ian Warrington 25/03/2008
David Harding 06/05/2010
Robert O'Driscoll 04/10/2012

Past Officers


Officer Name Past Since
Gregor Yeates 06/08/2012
David Shillington 06/05/2010

Notices of Change



Please note: Some Notices of Change may be listed with an Annual Return number. This is because they were originally added at the same time as the Annual Return. These processes are now considered separate by Charities Services, so are listed separately, but retain their Annual Return number.

Date Reference
05/02/2010 NOC002
07/05/2010 AR003
29/07/2013 AR006

Annual Returns


Due Date Received Link to Return
30/06/2009 AR002
30/06/2010 AR003
30/06/2011 AR004
30/06/2012 AR005
30/06/2013 AR006
30/06/2014 AR007
30/06/2015

Supporting Documents




Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name
07-05-2010 Record
26-08-2008 Record
18-03-2008 Supporting
15-11-2007 Rules
15-11-2007 Officer
15-11-2007 Officer
15-11-2007 Officer
15-11-2007 Officer
15-11-2007 Officer