#.
#.

Charity Summary

Information supplied by charities and displayed on the Charities Register is not verified by the Charities Commission.

These are the current details for: The Royal Society of New Zealand Endowment Fund Trust

Charity details


Legal name of the charity
The Royal Society of New Zealand Endowment Fund Trust
Other Name
Registration details
Status
Registered
Date
26/07/2010
Registration number
CC44759
IRD Number
Restricted
Annual Return Due Date
31/12/2014
Address for service
Charity's street address
11 Turnbull Street
Thorndon
Wellington 6011
Charity's postal address
P O Box 598
Wellington 6140
Charity's other details
Phone (day)
04 470 5767
Fax
04 473 1841
Email
phillippa.gardiner@royalsociety.org
Website

Charitable purpose


Note: Main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are in brackets

Sectors
(Promotion of science), Education / training / research, Environment / conservation
Activities
(Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)), Makes grants / loans to individuals, Provides advice / information / advocacy
Beneficiaries
(Scientists), Children / young people, General public, Children / young people, Children / young people

Areas of Operation


Nationwide

Officers


Officer Name Effective Date
Richard Christie 07/04/2010
Keith Hunter 07/04/2010
Dianne Mccarthy 07/04/2010
David Skegg 30/06/2012

Past Officers


Officer Name Past Since
Garth Carnaby 30/06/2012
Gregor Yeates 06/08/2012

Notices of Change



Please note: Some Notices of Change may be listed with an Annual Return number. This is because they were originally added at the same time as the Annual Return. These processes are now considered separate by Charities Services, so are listed separately, but retain their Annual Return number.

Date Reference
28/09/2011 AR002
31/10/2012 AR003

Annual Returns


Due Date Received Link to Return
31/12/2011 AR002
31/12/2012 AR003
31/12/2013 AR004
31/12/2014

Supporting Documents




Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name
14-07-2010 Rules
14-07-2010 Record